California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB31 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2013

Amended

Bill August 22, 2013
Bill June 6, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013