LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB31
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB31
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB31
Compare Versions
SB31 Chaptered October 4, 2013
SB31 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB31 Amended August 22, 2013
SB31 Amended June 6, 2013
SB31 Amended April 1, 2013
SB31 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB31 Chaptered October 4, 2013
SB31 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB31 Amended August 22, 2013
SB31 Amended June 6, 2013
SB31 Amended April 1, 2013
SB31 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare