|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 620, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4876.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6414.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2662.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2644.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 751.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 641.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|