California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB355 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill May 13, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 25, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013