LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB355
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB355
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB355
Compare Versions
SB355 Chaptered September 26, 2014
SB355 Enrolled August 28, 2014
SB355 Amended August 18, 2014
SB355 Amended August 4, 2014
SB355 Amended July 2, 2014
SB355 Amended May 27, 2014
SB355 Amended May 13, 2013
SB355 Amended May 7, 2013
SB355 Amended April 25, 2013
SB355 Amended April 15, 2013
SB355 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB355 Chaptered September 26, 2014
SB355 Enrolled August 28, 2014
SB355 Amended August 18, 2014
SB355 Amended August 4, 2014
SB355 Amended July 2, 2014
SB355 Amended May 27, 2014
SB355 Amended May 13, 2013
SB355 Amended May 7, 2013
SB355 Amended April 25, 2013
SB355 Amended April 15, 2013
SB355 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare