|
08/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 202, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1875.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2484.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 774.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|