California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB357 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 28, 2013

Amended

Bill June 14, 2013
Bill April 4, 2013