LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB357
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB357
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB357
Compare Versions
SB357 Chaptered August 28, 2013
SB357 Enrolled August 20, 2013
SB357 Amended June 14, 2013
SB357 Amended April 4, 2013
SB357 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB357 Chaptered August 28, 2013
SB357 Enrolled August 20, 2013
SB357 Amended June 14, 2013
SB357 Amended April 4, 2013
SB357 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare