Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2796.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 943.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 788.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|