LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB359
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB359
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB359
Compare Versions
SB359 Chaptered September 28, 2013
SB359 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB359 Amended September 12, 2013
SB359 Amended September 6, 2013
SB359 Enrolled September 3, 2013
SB359 Amended April 1, 2013
SB359 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB359 Chaptered September 28, 2013
SB359 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB359 Amended September 12, 2013
SB359 Amended September 6, 2013
SB359 Enrolled September 3, 2013
SB359 Amended April 1, 2013
SB359 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare