California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2013

Amended

Bill September 12, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013