|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 2281.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3004.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 944.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 936.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 662.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|