California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB36 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/11/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SB 36ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 10, 2013 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 9, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 8, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 30, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 8, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hueso DECEMBER 4, 2012 An act to add Section 901 to the Insurance Code, relating to workers' compensation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 36, Hueso. Internet Web site: workers' compensation insurers: workers' compensation data. Existing law requires every insurer doing business in this state to make and file with the Insurance Commissioner annual and quarterly financial statements, as prescribed. This bill would, beginning July 1, 2014, require the Department of Insurance to include on its Internet Web site a dedicated Internet Web page that includes workers' compensation data, statistics, and reports covering insurers. The bill would require the department to only use data already collected by the department or the Department of Industrial Relations, and authorize the department to provide on its Internet Web site direct links to relevant information on other Internet Web sites. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 901 is added to the Insurance Code, to read: 901. Beginning on July 1, 2014, the department shall include on its Internet Web site a dedicated Internet Web page that includes workers' compensation data, statistics, and reports covering insurers, including, but not limited to, claims loss data, expenses, and financial reports. The department shall only use data already collected by both the department and the Department of Industrial Relations, and may provide on its Web site direct links to relevant information on other Internet Web sites. Nothing in this section shall be construed to authorize the release of information protected by other applicable law.