California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB36 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2013

Amended

Bill August 8, 2013
Bill April 30, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013