|
10/05/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 602, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2166.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 2866.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2794.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2701.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1041.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 936.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 749.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|