California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB360 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2013

Amended

Bill August 30, 2013
Bill August 26, 2013
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill June 17, 2013
Bill May 20, 2013
Bill April 10, 2013