LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB360
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB360
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB360
Compare Versions
SB360 Chaptered October 5, 2013
SB360 Enrolled September 9, 2013
SB360 Amended August 30, 2013
SB360 Amended August 26, 2013
SB360 Amended August 6, 2013
SB360 Amended June 17, 2013
SB360 Amended May 20, 2013
SB360 Amended April 10, 2013
SB360 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB360 Chaptered October 5, 2013
SB360 Enrolled September 9, 2013
SB360 Amended August 30, 2013
SB360 Amended August 26, 2013
SB360 Amended August 6, 2013
SB360 Amended June 17, 2013
SB360 Amended May 20, 2013
SB360 Amended April 10, 2013
SB360 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare