|
10/04/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 567, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2172.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2841.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1092.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 990.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 753.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 696.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|