LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB364
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB364
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB364
Compare Versions
SB364 Chaptered October 4, 2013
SB364 Enrolled September 9, 2013
SB364 Amended August 15, 2013
SB364 Amended August 5, 2013
SB364 Amended June 26, 2013
SB364 Amended June 24, 2013
SB364 Amended May 7, 2013
SB364 Amended April 15, 2013
SB364 Amended April 4, 2013
SB364 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB364 Chaptered October 4, 2013
SB364 Enrolled September 9, 2013
SB364 Amended August 15, 2013
SB364 Amended August 5, 2013
SB364 Amended June 26, 2013
SB364 Amended June 24, 2013
SB364 Amended May 7, 2013
SB364 Amended April 15, 2013
SB364 Amended April 4, 2013
SB364 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare