California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB364 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2013

Amended

Bill August 15, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 26, 2013
Bill June 24, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013
Bill April 4, 2013