|
09/26/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 372, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2135.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2832.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2793.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 907.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 816.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 695.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|