California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB379 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2013

Amended

Bill August 30, 2013
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill April 17, 2013