LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB379
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB379
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB379
Compare Versions
SB379 Chaptered September 26, 2013
SB379 Enrolled September 6, 2013
SB379 Amended August 30, 2013
SB379 Amended August 6, 2013
SB379 Amended June 19, 2013
SB379 Amended April 17, 2013
SB379 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB379 Chaptered September 26, 2013
SB379 Enrolled September 6, 2013
SB379 Amended August 30, 2013
SB379 Amended August 6, 2013
SB379 Amended June 19, 2013
SB379 Amended April 17, 2013
SB379 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare