|
09/20/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 513, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5015.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4979.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4934.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6576.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6316.) Read third time and amended. (Page 6346.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4637.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6171.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6022.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1086.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 756.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|