LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB419
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB419
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB419
Compare Versions
SB419 Chaptered September 20, 2014
SB419 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB419 Amended August 22, 2014
SB419 Amended August 14, 2014
SB419 Amended July 3, 2014
SB419 Amended June 12, 2014
SB419 Amended March 10, 2014
SB419 Amended June 18, 2013
SB419 Amended May 8, 2013
SB419 Amended April 1, 2013
SB419 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB419 Chaptered September 20, 2014
SB419 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB419 Amended August 22, 2014
SB419 Amended August 14, 2014
SB419 Amended July 3, 2014
SB419 Amended June 12, 2014
SB419 Amended March 10, 2014
SB419 Amended June 18, 2013
SB419 Amended May 8, 2013
SB419 Amended April 1, 2013
SB419 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare