California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB419 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 14, 2014
Bill July 3, 2014
Bill June 12, 2014
Bill March 10, 2014
Bill June 18, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013