|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 546, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 0. Page 4544.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6022.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5970.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5547.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 2. Page 2621.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 990.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 751.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|