LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB434
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB434
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB434
Compare Versions
SB434 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB434 Enrolled August 19, 2014
SB434 Amended August 11, 2014
SB434 Enrolled June 18, 2014
SB434 Amended January 6, 2014
SB434 Amended May 24, 2013
SB434 Amended May 7, 2013
SB434 Amended April 29, 2013
SB434 Amended April 24, 2013
SB434 Amended April 1, 2013
SB434 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB434 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB434 Enrolled August 19, 2014
SB434 Amended August 11, 2014
SB434 Enrolled June 18, 2014
SB434 Amended January 6, 2014
SB434 Amended May 24, 2013
SB434 Amended May 7, 2013
SB434 Amended April 29, 2013
SB434 Amended April 24, 2013
SB434 Amended April 1, 2013
SB434 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare