LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB434
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB434
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB434
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 21, 2013
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 19, 2014
Compare
Bill
June 18, 2014
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 25, 2014
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 11, 2014
Compare
Bill
January 6, 2014
Compare
Bill
May 24, 2013
Compare
Bill
May 7, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 29, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 24, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 1, 2013
Compare