|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 547, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 4968.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Set for hearing August 28. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4959.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4919.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 6491.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6342.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 3534.) .
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2513.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 805.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 564.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|