California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB445 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill January 8, 2014
Bill August 26, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013