LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB445
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB445
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB445
Compare Versions
SB445 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB445 Enrolled September 4, 2014
SB445 Amended August 22, 2014
SB445 Amended August 18, 2014
SB445 Amended June 10, 2014
SB445 Amended January 8, 2014
SB445 Amended August 26, 2013
SB445 Amended August 12, 2013
SB445 Amended August 5, 2013
SB445 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB445 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB445 Enrolled September 4, 2014
SB445 Amended August 22, 2014
SB445 Amended August 18, 2014
SB445 Amended June 10, 2014
SB445 Amended January 8, 2014
SB445 Amended August 26, 2013
SB445 Amended August 12, 2013
SB445 Amended August 5, 2013
SB445 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare