|
07/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4255.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5650.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2621.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 2591.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2013
|
Set for hearing January 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H., GOV. & F., and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|