California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB469 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 16, 2014

Amended

Bill June 10, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014