LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB469
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB469
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB469
Compare Versions
SB469 Chaptered July 16, 2014
SB469 Enrolled July 7, 2014
SB469 Amended June 10, 2014
SB469 Amended January 6, 2014
SB469 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB469 Chaptered July 16, 2014
SB469 Enrolled July 7, 2014
SB469 Amended June 10, 2014
SB469 Amended January 6, 2014
SB469 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare