Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1042.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 750.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|