California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB48 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2012

Amended

Bill June 18, 2014
Bill March 18, 2014
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013