LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB48
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB48
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB48
Compare Versions
SB48 Amended June 18, 2014
SB48 Amended March 18, 2014
SB48 Amended June 19, 2013
SB48 Amended May 8, 2013
SB48 Amended April 8, 2013
SB48 Introduced December 19, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB48 Amended June 18, 2014
SB48 Amended March 18, 2014
SB48 Amended June 19, 2013
SB48 Amended May 8, 2013
SB48 Amended April 8, 2013
SB48 Introduced December 19, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare