Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Set for hearing August 27. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6283.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5108.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1105.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1015.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 759.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 465.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|