California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB486 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 9, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill July 3, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013