LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB486
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB486
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB486
Compare Versions
SB486 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB486 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB486 Amended August 21, 2014
SB486 Amended August 18, 2014
SB486 Amended August 4, 2014
SB486 Amended July 1, 2014
SB486 Amended June 9, 2014
SB486 Amended May 23, 2014
SB486 Amended September 3, 2013
SB486 Amended July 3, 2013
SB486 Amended April 15, 2013
SB486 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB486 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB486 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB486 Amended August 21, 2014
SB486 Amended August 18, 2014
SB486 Amended August 4, 2014
SB486 Amended July 1, 2014
SB486 Amended June 9, 2014
SB486 Amended May 23, 2014
SB486 Amended September 3, 2013
SB486 Amended July 3, 2013
SB486 Amended April 15, 2013
SB486 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare