|
08/12/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1698.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2290.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 907.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 791.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|