LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB488
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB488
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB488
Compare Versions
SB488 Chaptered August 12, 2013
SB488 Enrolled August 2, 2013
SB488 Amended June 26, 2013
SB488 Amended May 7, 2013
SB488 Amended April 22, 2013
SB488 Amended April 8, 2013
SB488 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB488 Chaptered August 12, 2013
SB488 Enrolled August 2, 2013
SB488 Amended June 26, 2013
SB488 Amended May 7, 2013
SB488 Amended April 22, 2013
SB488 Amended April 8, 2013
SB488 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare