California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB488 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 2, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 12, 2013

Amended

Bill June 26, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 22, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013