|
06/17/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1993.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1919.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1117.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1015.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 882.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|