California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB509 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill June 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill June 17, 2013

Amended

Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 22, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013