LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB509
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB509
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB509
Compare Versions
SB509 Enrolled June 18, 2013
SB509 Chaptered June 17, 2013
SB509 Amended May 24, 2013
SB509 Amended April 22, 2013
SB509 Amended April 16, 2013
SB509 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB509 Enrolled June 18, 2013
SB509 Chaptered June 17, 2013
SB509 Amended May 24, 2013
SB509 Amended April 22, 2013
SB509 Amended April 16, 2013
SB509 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare