Assembly
|
08/30/2014
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2014
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 35. Page 6766.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 44. Noes 27. Page 6328.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3190.) Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2951.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Made Special Order for Wednesday, May 29, at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1006.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 567.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|