LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB53
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB53
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB53
Compare Versions
SB53 Amended August 22, 2014
SB53 Amended June 5, 2014
SB53 Amended September 10, 2013
SB53 Amended September 6, 2013
SB53 Amended September 3, 2013
SB53 Amended June 27, 2013
SB53 Amended May 28, 2013
SB53 Amended April 1, 2013
SB53 Amended March 21, 2013
SB53 Introduced December 20, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB53 Amended August 22, 2014
SB53 Amended June 5, 2014
SB53 Amended September 10, 2013
SB53 Amended September 6, 2013
SB53 Amended September 3, 2013
SB53 Amended June 27, 2013
SB53 Amended May 28, 2013
SB53 Amended April 1, 2013
SB53 Amended March 21, 2013
SB53 Introduced December 20, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare