California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB53 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 20, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill June 5, 2014
Bill September 10, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill June 27, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013